THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:32:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 36 Grey Street
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 797-9940
Fax: (519) 797-1225

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site
LOCATION: Lions Head

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cipolletti Dyke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dyke (CPSO#: 75135 ) Dr. A. Cipolletti (CPSO#: 77918 )
Business Address: 36 Grey Street
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
(519) 797-9940

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 36 Grey Street
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 797-9940
Fax: (519) 797-1225

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site
LOCATION: Lions Head

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cipolletti Dyke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dyke (CPSO#: 75135 ) Dr. A. Cipolletti (CPSO#: 77918 )
Business Address: 36 Grey Street
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
(519) 797-9940

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIANA ALEXANDRA CIPOLLETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIPOLLETTI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIANA ALEXANDRA CIPOLLETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIPOLLETTI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002