THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 09:45:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit C
142 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 3H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 371-2220
Extension: 6026
Fax: (705) 337-6296

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Meilleur and Boucher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Boucher (CPSO#: 75988 ) Dr. C. Meilleur (CPSO#: 76593 )
Business Address: Unit 1
105 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 3J4
(705) 335-6012
Business Address: C-142 Progress Cres

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit C
142 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 3H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 371-2220
Extension: 6026
Fax: (705) 337-6296

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Meilleur and Boucher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Boucher (CPSO#: 75988 ) Dr. C. Meilleur (CPSO#: 76593 )
Business Address: Unit 1
105 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 3J4
(705) 335-6012
Business Address: C-142 Progress Cres

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE ANNE BOUCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUCHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE ANNE BOUCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUCHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2001
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2001