THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:09:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 142-C Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 3H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 371-2220
Extension: 6026
Fax: (705) 337-6296

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Meilleur and Boucher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Boucher (CPSO#: 75988 ) Dr. C. Meilleur (CPSO#: 76593 )
Business Address: Unit 1
105 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 3J4
(705) 335-6012
Business Address: C-142 Progress Cres

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 142-C Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 3H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 371-2220
Extension: 6026
Fax: (705) 337-6296

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Meilleur and Boucher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Boucher (CPSO#: 75988 ) Dr. C. Meilleur (CPSO#: 76593 )
Business Address: Unit 1
105 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 3J4
(705) 335-6012
Business Address: C-142 Progress Cres

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN MICHAEL MEILLEUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEILLEUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN MICHAEL MEILLEUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEILLEUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2001
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2001