THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:04:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Royal Ottawa Hospital
Department of Geriatric Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Extension: 6905
Fax: (613) 798-2999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tailor Lodha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tailor (CPSO#: 80880 ) Dr. V. Lodha (CPSO#: 76513 )
Business Address: LMC Diabetes and Endocrinology
208 - 4100 Strandherd Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2V 0V2
(613) 505-9704
Business Address: The Royal Ottawa Hospital
Department of Geriatric Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521 Extn: 6905

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Royal Ottawa Hospital
Department of Geriatric Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Extension: 6905
Fax: (613) 798-2999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tailor Lodha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tailor (CPSO#: 80880 ) Dr. V. Lodha (CPSO#: 76513 )
Business Address: LMC Diabetes and Endocrinology
208 - 4100 Strandherd Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2V 0V2
(613) 505-9704
Business Address: The Royal Ottawa Hospital
Department of Geriatric Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521 Extn: 6905

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VINAY LODHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LODHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VINAY LODHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LODHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001