THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:21:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4100 Strandherd Drive
Suite #208
Nepean Ontario K2J 0V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 505-9704
Fax: (613) 505-9707

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tailor Lodha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tailor (CPSO#: 80880 ) Dr. V. Lodha (CPSO#: 76513 )
Business Address: LMC Diabetes and Endocrinology
208 - 4100 Strandherd Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2V 0V2
(613) 505-9704
Business Address: The Royal Ottawa Hospital
Department of Geriatric Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521 Extn: 6905

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4100 Strandherd Drive
Suite #208
Nepean Ontario K2J 0V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 505-9704
Fax: (613) 505-9707

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tailor Lodha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tailor (CPSO#: 80880 ) Dr. V. Lodha (CPSO#: 76513 )
Business Address: LMC Diabetes and Endocrinology
208 - 4100 Strandherd Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2V 0V2
(613) 505-9704
Business Address: The Royal Ottawa Hospital
Department of Geriatric Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521 Extn: 6905

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHETNA TAILOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAILOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHETNA TAILOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAILOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004