THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:04:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karah Algird Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Algird (CPSO#: 76882 ) Dr. M. Karah (CPSO#: 81184 )
Business Address: Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road
Milton Ontario L9T 7H6
(905) 878-2383
Business Address: McMaster University
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Suite 715
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 44525
Business Address: 208 - 311 Commercial Street
Milton Ontario L9T 3Z9
(905) 875-2280

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karah Algird Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Algird (CPSO#: 76882 ) Dr. M. Karah (CPSO#: 81184 )
Business Address: Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road
Milton Ontario L9T 7H6
(905) 878-2383
Business Address: McMaster University
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Suite 715
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 44525
Business Address: 208 - 311 Commercial Street
Milton Ontario L9T 3Z9
(905) 875-2280

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Jul 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 01 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Almunder Ramah R Algird may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of Neurosurgery, McMaster University, in which Dr. Algird holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Algird no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Almunder Ramah R Algird may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of Neurosurgery, McMaster University, in which Dr. Algird holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Algird no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2001