THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:19:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
311 Commercial Street
Milton Ontario L9T 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 875-2280
Fax: (905) 875-9172

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 Jul 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karah Algird Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Algird (CPSO#: 76882 ) Dr. M. Karah (CPSO#: 81184 )
Business Address: Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road
Milton Ontario L9T 7H6
(905) 878-2383
Business Address: McMaster University
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Suite 715
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 44525
Business Address: 208 - 311 Commercial Street
Milton Ontario L9T 3Z9
(905) 875-2280

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
311 Commercial Street
Milton Ontario L9T 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 875-2280
Fax: (905) 875-9172

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 Jul 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karah Algird Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Algird (CPSO#: 76882 ) Dr. M. Karah (CPSO#: 81184 )
Business Address: Milton District Hospital
7030 Derry Road
Milton Ontario L9T 7H6
(905) 878-2383
Business Address: McMaster University
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Suite 715
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 44525
Business Address: 208 - 311 Commercial Street
Milton Ontario L9T 3Z9
(905) 875-2280

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUNIA MAHMOUD ABDELMAJEED KARAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUNIA MAHMOUD ABDELMAJEED KARAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Jan 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2004