THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 07:11:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
General Hospital
McMaster Clinic Room 504
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-0271
Extension: 44967
Fax: (905) 577-8228

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 11 Oct 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adel Dyub Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dyub (CPSO#: 77121 ) Dr. N. Hawisa (CPSO#: 78991 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
General Hospital
McMaster Clinic Room 504
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-0271
Extension: 44967
Fax: (905) 577-8228

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 11 Oct 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adel Dyub Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dyub (CPSO#: 77121 ) Dr. N. Hawisa (CPSO#: 78991 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADEL MAHMUD ALI DYUB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DYUB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADEL MAHMUD ALI DYUB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DYUB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2001
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2001