THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:21:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Rockhaven Lane
Hamilton Ontario L0R 2H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056899499
Fax: 9056895284
Address: unit 103-170 Rockhaven lane
Hamilton Ontario L8B 1B5
Phone: 9056899499
Fax: 9056895284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 14 Nov 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adel Dyub Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dyub (CPSO#: 77121 ) Dr. N. Hawisa (CPSO#: 78991 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Rockhaven Lane
Hamilton Ontario L0R 2H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056899499
Fax: 9056895284
Address: unit 103-170 Rockhaven lane
Hamilton Ontario L8B 1B5
Phone: 9056899499
Fax: 9056895284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 14 Nov 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adel Dyub Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dyub (CPSO#: 77121 ) Dr. N. Hawisa (CPSO#: 78991 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NURA IBRAHIM SHEIBANI HAWISA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAWISA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NURA IBRAHIM SHEIBANI HAWISA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAWISA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 May 2003
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 May 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 May 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 May 2003