THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:03:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit-1280 Main St W
Hamilton Health Sciences
2F55
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: 9055260594

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 02 Oct 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Greenwald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Greenwald (CPSO#: 77511 ) Dr. E. Kogan (CPSO#: 80859 )
Business Address: 2F55 - 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit-1280 Main St W
Hamilton Health Sciences
2F55
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: 9055260594

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 02 Oct 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Greenwald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Greenwald (CPSO#: 77511 ) Dr. E. Kogan (CPSO#: 80859 )
Business Address: 2F55 - 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC RICHARD GREENWALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENWALD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC RICHARD GREENWALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENWALD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002