THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 17:41:39 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 379 Church St. Unit 404A
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 471-1444
Fax: (905) 471-1777
Address: Adult Diabetes Education Center
379 Church St., Unit #308
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
Phone: (905) 472-7527
Fax: (905) 472-7533

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 31 Dec 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Greenwald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Greenwald (CPSO#: 77511 ) Dr. E. Kogan (CPSO#: 80859 )
Business Address: 2F55 - 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 379 Church St. Unit 404A
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 471-1444
Fax: (905) 471-1777
Address: Adult Diabetes Education Center
379 Church St., Unit #308
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
Phone: (905) 472-7527
Fax: (905) 472-7533

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 31 Dec 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Greenwald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Greenwald (CPSO#: 77511 ) Dr. E. Kogan (CPSO#: 80859 )
Business Address: 2F55 - 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVA KOGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOGAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVA KOGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOGAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 May 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004