THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 17:09:16 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 302-85 Norfolk St
Guelph Ontario N1H 4J4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Dec 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. A.J. Northey and W.D.J. Ruddock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Ruddock (CPSO#: 79303 ) Dr. A. Northey (CPSO#: 77644 )
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350
Business Address: 302 - 85 Norfolk Street
Guelph Ontario N1H 4J4
(519) 822-1871

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 302-85 Norfolk St
Guelph Ontario N1H 4J4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Dec 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. A.J. Northey and W.D.J. Ruddock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Ruddock (CPSO#: 79303 ) Dr. A. Northey (CPSO#: 77644 )
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350
Business Address: 302 - 85 Norfolk Street
Guelph Ontario N1H 4J4
(519) 822-1871

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELA JOY NORTHEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORTHEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELA JOY NORTHEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NORTHEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002