THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 06:40:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 302
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph Ontario N1H 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-1871
Fax: (519) 822-1990

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. A.J. Northey and W.D.J. Ruddock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Ruddock (CPSO#: 79303 ) Dr. A. Northey (CPSO#: 77644 )
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350
Business Address: 302 - 85 Norfolk Street
Guelph Ontario N1H 4J4
(519) 822-1871

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 302
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph Ontario N1H 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-1871
Fax: (519) 822-1990

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. A.J. Northey and W.D.J. Ruddock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Ruddock (CPSO#: 79303 ) Dr. A. Northey (CPSO#: 77644 )
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350
Business Address: 302 - 85 Norfolk Street
Guelph Ontario N1H 4J4
(519) 822-1871

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM DONALD JEFFREY RUDDOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUDDOCK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM DONALD JEFFREY RUDDOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUDDOCK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003