THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 09:23:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Nephrology
CNIB Kidney Centre
1929 Bayview Avenue, Suite 382
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-5590
Fax: (416) 480-7881

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zahirieh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Konvalinka (CPSO#: 79578 ) Dr. A. Zahirieh (CPSO#: 77807 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Division of Nephrology
Suite 11-PMB-189
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 6950
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Nephrology
Suite 382
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
(416) 480-4976

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Nephrology
CNIB Kidney Centre
1929 Bayview Avenue, Suite 382
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-5590
Fax: (416) 480-7881

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zahirieh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Konvalinka (CPSO#: 79578 ) Dr. A. Zahirieh (CPSO#: 77807 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Division of Nephrology
Suite 11-PMB-189
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 6950
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Nephrology
Suite 382
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
(416) 480-4976

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALIREZA ZAHIRIEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAHIRIEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALIREZA ZAHIRIEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAHIRIEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002