THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:16:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN, SERBIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 585 University Ave
Toronto General Hospital, MaRS building
Division of Nephrology
9th floor, suite 9068
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-4800
Extension: 6950
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zahirieh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Konvalinka (CPSO#: 79578 ) Dr. A. Zahirieh (CPSO#: 77807 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Division of Nephrology
Suite 11-PMB-189
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 6950
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Nephrology
Suite 382
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
(416) 480-4976

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN, SERBIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 585 University Ave
Toronto General Hospital, MaRS building
Division of Nephrology
9th floor, suite 9068
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-4800
Extension: 6950
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zahirieh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Konvalinka (CPSO#: 79578 ) Dr. A. Zahirieh (CPSO#: 77807 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Division of Nephrology
Suite 11-PMB-189
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 6950
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Nephrology
Suite 382
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
(416) 480-4976

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANA KONVALINKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONVALINKA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANA KONVALINKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONVALINKA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003