THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:09:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
5 Mclaughlin Wing Rm 420
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5386
Fax: (416) 603-5083

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 19 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amad & Albashir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Amad (CPSO#: 77874 ) Dr. S. Albashir (CPSO#: 98972 )
Business Address: 1276 Woodland Ave
Mississauga ON L5G 2X9

Corporation Name: Amad & Albashir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Sep 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
5 Mclaughlin Wing Rm 420
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5386
Fax: (416) 603-5083

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 19 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amad & Albashir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Amad (CPSO#: 77874 ) Dr. S. Albashir (CPSO#: 98972 )
Business Address: 1276 Woodland Ave
Mississauga ON L5G 2X9

Corporation Name: Amad & Albashir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Sep 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANI AMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANI AMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002