THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:12:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 521 2100
Extension: 74598
Fax: 905-526-0594

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 27 Oct 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 27 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amad & Albashir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Amad (CPSO#: 77874 ) Dr. S. Albashir (CPSO#: 98972 )
Business Address: 1276 Woodland Ave
Mississauga ON L5G 2X9

Corporation Name: Amad & Albashir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Sep 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 521 2100
Extension: 74598
Fax: 905-526-0594

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 27 Oct 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 27 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amad & Albashir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Amad (CPSO#: 77874 ) Dr. S. Albashir (CPSO#: 98972 )
Business Address: 1276 Woodland Ave
Mississauga ON L5G 2X9

Corporation Name: Amad & Albashir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Sep 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIWAR MAZEN ALBASHIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALBASHIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIWAR MAZEN ALBASHIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALBASHIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012