THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 18:42:01 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
8 Eaton North Room 235
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 3565
Fax: (416) 340-4198

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. LI & A. TAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Li (CPSO#: 78720 ) Dr. A. Tan (CPSO#: 77891 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
8 Eaton North Room 235
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Room 6-045
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Address: 123 Edward Street
Suite 1011
Toronto Ontario M5G 0A8
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
Unit 301
Toronto Ontario M1R 0B1
Business Address: 5 Fairview Mall Drive
Suite 412
Toronto Ontario M2J 2Z1
Business Address: 1835 Yonge Street
Suite 303
Toronto Ontario M4S 1X8
Business Address: 135 Queens Plate Drive
Suite 140
Toronto Ontario M9W 6V1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
8 Eaton North Room 235
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 3565
Fax: (416) 340-4198

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. LI & A. TAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Li (CPSO#: 78720 ) Dr. A. Tan (CPSO#: 77891 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
8 Eaton North Room 235
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Room 6-045
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Address: 123 Edward Street
Suite 1011
Toronto Ontario M5G 0A8
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
Unit 301
Toronto Ontario M1R 0B1
Business Address: 5 Fairview Mall Drive
Suite 412
Toronto Ontario M2J 2Z1
Business Address: 1835 Yonge Street
Suite 303
Toronto Ontario M4S 1X8
Business Address: 135 Queens Plate Drive
Suite 140
Toronto Ontario M9W 6V1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIENNE ONG TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIENNE ONG TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002