THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:29:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Division of Respirology Room 6-045
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-6026
Fax: (416) 864-5649
Address: Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
123 Edward Street
Suite 1011
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E2
Phone: (416) 813-2277
Fax: (416) 260-3203
Address: unit 301-520 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1R 0B1
Phone: 4164390130
Fax: 4164395508

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 16 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. LI & A. TAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Li (CPSO#: 78720 ) Dr. A. Tan (CPSO#: 77891 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
8 Eaton North Room 235
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Room 6-045
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Address: 123 Edward Street
Suite 1011
Toronto Ontario M5G 0A8
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
Unit 301
Toronto Ontario M1R 0B1
Business Address: 5 Fairview Mall Drive
Suite 412
Toronto Ontario M2J 2Z1
Business Address: 1835 Yonge Street
Suite 303
Toronto Ontario M4S 1X8
Business Address: 135 Queens Plate Drive
Suite 140
Toronto Ontario M9W 6V1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Division of Respirology Room 6-045
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-6026
Fax: (416) 864-5649
Address: Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
123 Edward Street
Suite 1011
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E2
Phone: (416) 813-2277
Fax: (416) 260-3203
Address: unit 301-520 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1R 0B1
Phone: 4164390130
Fax: 4164395508

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 16 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. LI & A. TAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Li (CPSO#: 78720 ) Dr. A. Tan (CPSO#: 77891 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
8 Eaton North Room 235
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Room 6-045
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Address: 123 Edward Street
Suite 1011
Toronto Ontario M5G 0A8
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
Unit 301
Toronto Ontario M1R 0B1
Business Address: 5 Fairview Mall Drive
Suite 412
Toronto Ontario M2J 2Z1
Business Address: 1835 Yonge Street
Suite 303
Toronto Ontario M4S 1X8
Business Address: 135 Queens Plate Drive
Suite 140
Toronto Ontario M9W 6V1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER KEVIN LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER KEVIN LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jan 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2002
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2002