THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 08:38:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Stellenbosch, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Extension: 2030
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Extension: 2030
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 875 6th St East
Owen Sound
N4K 5W5
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 5W5
Phone: (519) 376-4420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cornelius Johannes Van Zyl and Lizette Van Zyl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Van Zyl (CPSO#: 78852 ) Dr. C. Van Zyl (CPSO#: 78064 )
Business Address: 875 Sixth Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 5W5
(519) 367-4420
Business Address: Owen Sound Hospital
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121
Business Address: Owen Sound Family Health Team
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
(519) 470-3030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of Stellenbosch, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Extension: 2030
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Extension: 2030
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 875 6th St East
Owen Sound
N4K 5W5
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 5W5
Phone: (519) 376-4420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cornelius Johannes Van Zyl and Lizette Van Zyl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Van Zyl (CPSO#: 78852 ) Dr. C. Van Zyl (CPSO#: 78064 )
Business Address: 875 Sixth Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 5W5
(519) 367-4420
Business Address: Owen Sound Hospital
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121
Business Address: Owen Sound Family Health Team
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
(519) 470-3030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CORNELIUS JOHANNES VAN ZYL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN ZYL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CORNELIUS JOHANNES VAN ZYL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN ZYL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Stellenbosch, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2002
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2002