THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:31:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Stellenbosch, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Owen Sound family health team
1415 1 ST AVE W
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: (519) 470-3035

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cornelius Johannes Van Zyl and Lizette Van Zyl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Van Zyl (CPSO#: 78852 ) Dr. C. Van Zyl (CPSO#: 78064 )
Business Address: 875 Sixth Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 5W5
(519) 367-4420
Business Address: Owen Sound Hospital
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121
Business Address: Owen Sound Family Health Team
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
(519) 470-3030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of Stellenbosch, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Owen Sound family health team
1415 1 ST AVE W
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: (519) 470-3035

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cornelius Johannes Van Zyl and Lizette Van Zyl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Van Zyl (CPSO#: 78852 ) Dr. C. Van Zyl (CPSO#: 78064 )
Business Address: 875 Sixth Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 5W5
(519) 367-4420
Business Address: Owen Sound Hospital
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121
Business Address: Owen Sound Family Health Team
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
(519) 470-3030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIZETTE VAN ZYL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN ZYL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIZETTE VAN ZYL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN ZYL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Stellenbosch, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2003
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2003