THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:01:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 668 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 4T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 538-4146
Fax: (905) 538-4147
Address: Juravinski Hospital
Department of Medicine,
McMaster University
Room A3-12, 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 389-4411
Extension: 42760
Fax: (905) 381-7042
Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Cir
Mississauga ON L5N 2Y1
Phone: 905-858-8520
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 07 Jul 2004
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 07 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ammar Gilani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gilani (CPSO#: 78591 ) Dr. S. Gilani (CPSO#: 78712 )
Business Address: 668 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 4T9
(905) 538-4146
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
Department of Medicine,
McMaster University-Room A3-12
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 42760

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 668 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 4T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 538-4146
Fax: (905) 538-4147
Address: Juravinski Hospital
Department of Medicine,
McMaster University
Room A3-12, 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 389-4411
Extension: 42760
Fax: (905) 381-7042
Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Cir
Mississauga ON L5N 2Y1
Phone: 905-858-8520
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 07 Jul 2004
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 07 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ammar Gilani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gilani (CPSO#: 78591 ) Dr. S. Gilani (CPSO#: 78712 )
Business Address: 668 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 4T9
(905) 538-4146
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
Department of Medicine,
McMaster University-Room A3-12
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 42760

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
30 Jan 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 30 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Ammar Anwar Gilani may practise medicine independently in neurology, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Ammar Anwar Gilani may practise medicine independently in neurology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2002