THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 16:44:22 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 668 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 4T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 538-4146
Fax: (905) 538-4147

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 29 Apr 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ammar Gilani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gilani (CPSO#: 78591 ) Dr. S. Gilani (CPSO#: 78712 )
Business Address: 668 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 4T9
(905) 538-4146
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
Department of Medicine,
McMaster University-Room A3-12
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 42760

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 668 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 4T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 538-4146
Fax: (905) 538-4147

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 29 Apr 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ammar Gilani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gilani (CPSO#: 78591 ) Dr. S. Gilani (CPSO#: 78712 )
Business Address: 668 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 4T9
(905) 538-4146
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
Department of Medicine,
McMaster University-Room A3-12
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 42760

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SADIA GILANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SADIA GILANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2002
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2002