THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 15:58:19 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Anaesthesia
and Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Road P O Box 5339
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3022
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 23 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dhir & Dhir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dhir (CPSO#: 78676 ) Dr. S. Dhir (CPSO#: 81737 )
Business Address: LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Anaesthesia & Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Road
P.O. Box 5339
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: SJHC
Department of Anaesthesia & Perioperative Medicine
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100

Corporation Name: Dhir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Jan 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Anaesthesia
and Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Road P O Box 5339
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3022
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 23 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dhir & Dhir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dhir (CPSO#: 78676 ) Dr. S. Dhir (CPSO#: 81737 )
Business Address: LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Anaesthesia & Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Road
P.O. Box 5339
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: SJHC
Department of Anaesthesia & Perioperative Medicine
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100

Corporation Name: Dhir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Jan 2017

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Feb 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 01 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ACHAL KUMAR DHIR may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ACHAL KUMAR DHIR may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Feb 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 May 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 May 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Jan 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 12 May 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 May 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2002