THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:44:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: SJHC, Department of Anesthesia
& Perioperative Medicine
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6000
Fax: (519) 646-6116
Address: Victorla Hospital, LHSC
800 Commissioner Road East
London Ontario N6C 2V5
Phone: (519) 685-8141
Extension: 55115
Fax: No Information Available
Address: LHSC
Department of Anesthesia &
Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Road, P O Box 5339
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2006
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dhir & Dhir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dhir (CPSO#: 78676 ) Dr. S. Dhir (CPSO#: 81737 )
Business Address: LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Anaesthesia & Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Road
P.O. Box 5339
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: SJHC
Department of Anaesthesia & Perioperative Medicine
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100

Corporation Name: Dhir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Jan 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: SJHC, Department of Anesthesia
& Perioperative Medicine
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6000
Fax: (519) 646-6116
Address: Victorla Hospital, LHSC
800 Commissioner Road East
London Ontario N6C 2V5
Phone: (519) 685-8141
Extension: 55115
Fax: No Information Available
Address: LHSC
Department of Anesthesia &
Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Road, P O Box 5339
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2006
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dhir & Dhir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dhir (CPSO#: 78676 ) Dr. S. Dhir (CPSO#: 81737 )
Business Address: LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Anaesthesia & Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Road
P.O. Box 5339
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: SJHC
Department of Anaesthesia & Perioperative Medicine
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100

Corporation Name: Dhir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Jan 2017

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Feb 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 01 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SHALINI DHIR may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SHALINI DHIR may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Feb 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2004