THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:00:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 170
4600 Highway 7
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 746-1818
Fax: (416) 746-1815
Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 04 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patrick Tansey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mackay (CPSO#: 78783 ) Dr. P. Tansey (CPSO#: 78758 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: 4600 Highway 7
Suite 170
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
(416) 746-1818

Corporation Name: Dr. Helen J Mackay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mackay (CPSO#: 78783 ) Dr. P. Tansey (CPSO#: 78758 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite T2-023
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-5145

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 170
4600 Highway 7
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 746-1818
Fax: (416) 746-1815
Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 04 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patrick Tansey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mackay (CPSO#: 78783 ) Dr. P. Tansey (CPSO#: 78758 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: 4600 Highway 7
Suite 170
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
(416) 746-1818

Corporation Name: Dr. Helen J Mackay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mackay (CPSO#: 78783 ) Dr. P. Tansey (CPSO#: 78758 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite T2-023
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-5145

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK ALFRED HARBISON TANSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANSEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK ALFRED HARBISON TANSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANSEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 08 Jan 2020
Summary:
Note: Effective August 18, 2021, Dr. Tansey has completed the required elements of his SCERP.
 
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review.

Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 08 Jan 2020
Summary:
Note: Effective August 18, 2021, Dr. Tansey has completed the required elements of his SCERP.
 
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review.

Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
 

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2003
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2003

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2003