THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:18:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook Heath Sciences Centre
Suite T2-023
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 480 5145
Fax: 416 480 6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 13 Sep 2005
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patrick Tansey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mackay (CPSO#: 78783 ) Dr. P. Tansey (CPSO#: 78758 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: 4600 Highway 7
Suite 170
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
(416) 746-1818

Corporation Name: Dr. Helen J Mackay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mackay (CPSO#: 78783 ) Dr. P. Tansey (CPSO#: 78758 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite T2-023
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-5145

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook Heath Sciences Centre
Suite T2-023
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 480 5145
Fax: 416 480 6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 13 Sep 2005
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patrick Tansey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mackay (CPSO#: 78783 ) Dr. P. Tansey (CPSO#: 78758 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: 4600 Highway 7
Suite 170
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
(416) 746-1818

Corporation Name: Dr. Helen J Mackay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mackay (CPSO#: 78783 ) Dr. P. Tansey (CPSO#: 78758 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite T2-023
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-5145

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Jul 2012
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 01 2012
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Helen Jane Mackay may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
University of Toronto, in which Dr. Mackay holds an academic
appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Mackay no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.




VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Helen Jane Mackay may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
University of Toronto, in which Dr. Mackay holds an academic
appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Mackay no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.




Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Edinburgh, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 04 May 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Oct 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 04 May 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2003

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2003