THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 18:57:16 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bayside Medical Centre
3 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 549-3939
Fax: (705) 549-0029
Address: Ll1-5 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie Endoscopy Clinic
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Phone: 705-797-1112
Fax: 705-797-1113
Address: Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrew's Drive
P O Box 760
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-1300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 500 Church St
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health
Penetanguishene ON L9M 1G3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene
HOSPITAL: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Badenhorst and Blom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Blom (CPSO#: 79215 ) Dr. J. Badenhorst (CPSO#: 79216 )
Business Address: Bayside Medical Centre
3 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1B9
(705) 549-3939

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bayside Medical Centre
3 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 549-3939
Fax: (705) 549-0029
Address: Ll1-5 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie Endoscopy Clinic
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Phone: 705-797-1112
Fax: 705-797-1113
Address: Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrew's Drive
P O Box 760
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-1300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 500 Church St
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health
Penetanguishene ON L9M 1G3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene
HOSPITAL: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Badenhorst and Blom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Blom (CPSO#: 79215 ) Dr. J. Badenhorst (CPSO#: 79216 )
Business Address: Bayside Medical Centre
3 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1B9
(705) 549-3939

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE RITA BLOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE RITA BLOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2003