THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:26:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bayside Medical Centre
3 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 549-3939
Fax: (705) 549-0029
Address: 1112 St Andrews Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526 1300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Badenhorst and Blom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Blom (CPSO#: 79215 ) Dr. J. Badenhorst (CPSO#: 79216 )
Business Address: Bayside Medical Centre
3 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1B9
(705) 549-3939

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bayside Medical Centre
3 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 549-3939
Fax: (705) 549-0029
Address: 1112 St Andrews Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526 1300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Badenhorst and Blom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Blom (CPSO#: 79215 ) Dr. J. Badenhorst (CPSO#: 79216 )
Business Address: Bayside Medical Centre
3 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1B9
(705) 549-3939

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHANNES GERHARDUS BADENHORST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADENHORST is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHANNES GERHARDUS BADENHORST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADENHORST is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Oct 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2003