THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 08:30:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Maiden Lane
St. Marys Ontario N4X 1B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 284-3450
Fax: 519-284-2125

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gilmour O'Neill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gilmour (CPSO#: 79502 ) Dr. C. O'Neill (CPSO#: 84839 )
Business Address: St. Marys Memorial Hospital
267 Queen Street West
St Marys Ontario N4X 1C4
(519) 284-1332
Business Address: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
(519) 273-4100
Business Address: Happy Valley Family Health Team
268 Maiden Lane
St Marys Ontario N4X 1B7
(519) 284-3450

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Maiden Lane
St. Marys Ontario N4X 1B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 284-3450
Fax: 519-284-2125

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gilmour O'Neill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gilmour (CPSO#: 79502 ) Dr. C. O'Neill (CPSO#: 84839 )
Business Address: St. Marys Memorial Hospital
267 Queen Street West
St Marys Ontario N4X 1C4
(519) 284-1332
Business Address: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
(519) 273-4100
Business Address: Happy Valley Family Health Team
268 Maiden Lane
St Marys Ontario N4X 1B7
(519) 284-3450

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY EMILIA GILMOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILMOUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY EMILIA GILMOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILMOUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003