THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 17:21:29 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 273-4100
Extension: 6
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gilmour O'Neill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gilmour (CPSO#: 79502 ) Dr. C. O'Neill (CPSO#: 84839 )
Business Address: St. Marys Memorial Hospital
267 Queen Street West
St Marys Ontario N4X 1C4
(519) 284-1332
Business Address: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
(519) 273-4100
Business Address: Happy Valley Family Health Team
268 Maiden Lane
St Marys Ontario N4X 1B7
(519) 284-3450

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 273-4100
Extension: 6
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gilmour O'Neill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gilmour (CPSO#: 79502 ) Dr. C. O'Neill (CPSO#: 84839 )
Business Address: St. Marys Memorial Hospital
267 Queen Street West
St Marys Ontario N4X 1C4
(519) 284-1332
Business Address: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
(519) 273-4100
Business Address: Happy Valley Family Health Team
268 Maiden Lane
St Marys Ontario N4X 1B7
(519) 284-3450

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CRAIG DAVID O'NEILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'NEILL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CRAIG DAVID O'NEILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'NEILL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006