THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 18:01:09 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 990 Gainsborough Rd
London ON N6H 5L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-601-8621
Extension: 105
Fax: 519-204-0729

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul and Pamula Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Paul (CPSO#: 84253 ) Dr. A. Pamula (CPSO#: 80693 )
Business Address: 215 Fanshawe Park Road West
2nd Floor
London Ontario N6G 5A9
(519) 645-2444
Business Address: Suite 300
140 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N6A 5R9
(519) 850-3234
Business Address: 990 Gainsborough Rd
1st floor
London ON N6H 5L4
519-601-8621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 990 Gainsborough Rd
London ON N6H 5L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-601-8621
Extension: 105
Fax: 519-204-0729

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul and Pamula Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Paul (CPSO#: 84253 ) Dr. A. Pamula (CPSO#: 80693 )
Business Address: 215 Fanshawe Park Road West
2nd Floor
London Ontario N6G 5A9
(519) 645-2444
Business Address: Suite 300
140 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N6A 5R9
(519) 850-3234
Business Address: 990 Gainsborough Rd
1st floor
London ON N6H 5L4
519-601-8621

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA PAMULA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAMULA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREA PAMULA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAMULA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004