THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:21:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 215 Fanshawe Park Rd. West
2nd Floor
London Ontario N6G 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 645-2444
Fax: 519-286-6789

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul and Pamula Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Paul (CPSO#: 84253 ) Dr. A. Pamula (CPSO#: 80693 )
Business Address: 215 Fanshawe Park Road West
2nd Floor
London Ontario N6G 5A9
(519) 645-2444
Business Address: Suite 300
140 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N6A 5R9
(519) 850-3234
Business Address: 990 Gainsborough Rd
1st floor
London ON N6H 5L4
519-601-8621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 215 Fanshawe Park Rd. West
2nd Floor
London Ontario N6G 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 645-2444
Fax: 519-286-6789

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul and Pamula Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Paul (CPSO#: 84253 ) Dr. A. Pamula (CPSO#: 80693 )
Business Address: 215 Fanshawe Park Road West
2nd Floor
London Ontario N6G 5A9
(519) 645-2444
Business Address: Suite 300
140 Oxford Street East
London Ontario N6A 5R9
(519) 850-3234
Business Address: 990 Gainsborough Rd
1st floor
London ON N6H 5L4
519-601-8621

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARTHA PRATIM PAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAUL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARTHA PRATIM PAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAUL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006