THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:16:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Union Street
Grand Falls - Windsor Newfoundland and Labrador A2A 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7092922500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

HOSPITAL: Seaforth Community Hospital
LOCATION: Seaforth

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Powell Turner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Powell (CPSO#: 81211 ) Dr. M. Turner (CPSO#: 81286 )
Business Address: Mitchell Family Doctors
7 Frances Street
Mitchell Ontario N5A 8B9
(519) 348-8402

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Union Street
Grand Falls - Windsor Newfoundland and Labrador A2A 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7092922500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

HOSPITAL: Seaforth Community Hospital
LOCATION: Seaforth

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Powell Turner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Powell (CPSO#: 81211 ) Dr. M. Turner (CPSO#: 81286 )
Business Address: Mitchell Family Doctors
7 Frances Street
Mitchell Ontario N5A 8B9
(519) 348-8402

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK RICHARD POWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK RICHARD POWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004