THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 08:52:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 164 Goodyear Avenue
Grand Falls-Windsor Newfoundland and Labrador A2A 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 709-292-8400
Fax: 709-292-8404
Address: Central Newfoundland
Regional Health Centre
50 Union Street
Grand Falls-Windsor Newfoundland and Labrador A2A 0B7
Phone: 709 292 2500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Powell Turner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Powell (CPSO#: 81211 ) Dr. M. Turner (CPSO#: 81286 )
Business Address: Mitchell Family Doctors
7 Frances Street
Mitchell Ontario N5A 8B9
(519) 348-8402

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 164 Goodyear Avenue
Grand Falls-Windsor Newfoundland and Labrador A2A 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 709-292-8400
Fax: 709-292-8404
Address: Central Newfoundland
Regional Health Centre
50 Union Street
Grand Falls-Windsor Newfoundland and Labrador A2A 0B7
Phone: 709 292 2500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Powell Turner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Powell (CPSO#: 81211 ) Dr. M. Turner (CPSO#: 81286 )
Business Address: Mitchell Family Doctors
7 Frances Street
Mitchell Ontario N5A 8B9
(519) 348-8402

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA DAWN TURNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURNER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA DAWN TURNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURNER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004