THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:12:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ellis Park Medical
1959 Bloor Street West
M6S 1M4
Toronto Ontario M6S 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 639-6321
Fax: (416) 639-6322

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linder Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Linder (CPSO#: 81391 ) Dr. A. Malek (CPSO#: 93435 )

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Linder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Linder (CPSO#: 81391 )
Business Address: Suite 2 & 3
1959 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 1M4
(416) 639-6321

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ellis Park Medical
1959 Bloor Street West
M6S 1M4
Toronto Ontario M6S 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 639-6321
Fax: (416) 639-6322

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linder Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Linder (CPSO#: 81391 ) Dr. A. Malek (CPSO#: 93435 )

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Linder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Linder (CPSO#: 81391 )
Business Address: Suite 2 & 3
1959 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 1M4
(416) 639-6321

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK ROBIN LINDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK ROBIN LINDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004