THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:48:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ellis Park Medical
1959 Bloor Street West Unit 2
Toronto Ontario M6S 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 639-6321
Fax: (416) 639-6322

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anna Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Malek (CPSO#: 93435 )
Business Address: 1959 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M6S 1M4
416-639-6321

Corporation Name: Linder Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Linder (CPSO#: 81391 ) Dr. A. Malek (CPSO#: 93435 )

Corporation Name: Dr. Anna Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 May 2023

Corporation Name: Dr. Anna Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Feb 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ellis Park Medical
1959 Bloor Street West Unit 2
Toronto Ontario M6S 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 639-6321
Fax: (416) 639-6322

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anna Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Malek (CPSO#: 93435 )
Business Address: 1959 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M6S 1M4
416-639-6321

Corporation Name: Linder Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Linder (CPSO#: 81391 ) Dr. A. Malek (CPSO#: 93435 )

Corporation Name: Dr. Anna Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 May 2023

Corporation Name: Dr. Anna Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Feb 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA MARIA MALEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA MARIA MALEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010