THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 16:27:51 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: WRH Ouellette Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 145
2475 McDougall St
Windsor Ontario N8X 3N9
Phone: 519-800-0884
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 17 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jul 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mondeep Narewal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Narewal (CPSO#: 81393 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4401

Corporation Name: Dr. Curt Wimmer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Narewal (CPSO#: 81393 ) Dr. C. Wimmer (CPSO#: 94455 )
Business Address: 1083 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 4J8
Business Address: 194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Business Address: 145 - 2475 McDougall Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 3N9

Corporation Name: Dr. Charlotte Logan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jan 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: WRH Ouellette Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 145
2475 McDougall St
Windsor Ontario N8X 3N9
Phone: 519-800-0884
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 17 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jul 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mondeep Narewal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Narewal (CPSO#: 81393 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4401

Corporation Name: Dr. Curt Wimmer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Narewal (CPSO#: 81393 ) Dr. C. Wimmer (CPSO#: 94455 )
Business Address: 1083 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 4J8
Business Address: 194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Business Address: 145 - 2475 McDougall Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 3N9

Corporation Name: Dr. Charlotte Logan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jan 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONDEEP NAREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAREWAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONDEEP NAREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAREWAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004