THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:22:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1083 Ouellette
Windsor Ontario N9A 4J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 915-7125
Fax: (519) 962-3339
Address: 194 Talbot Street W
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Phone: 519-326-2373
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 22101 Morross
Detroit Michigan United States 48236
Phone: 313-343-4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 01 Oct 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Curt Wimmer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Narewal (CPSO#: 81393 ) Dr. C. Wimmer (CPSO#: 94455 )
Business Address: 1083 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 4J8
Business Address: 194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Business Address: 145 - 2475 McDougall Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 3N9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1083 Ouellette
Windsor Ontario N9A 4J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 915-7125
Fax: (519) 962-3339
Address: 194 Talbot Street W
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Phone: 519-326-2373
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 22101 Morross
Detroit Michigan United States 48236
Phone: 313-343-4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 01 Oct 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Curt Wimmer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Narewal (CPSO#: 81393 ) Dr. C. Wimmer (CPSO#: 94455 )
Business Address: 1083 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 4J8
Business Address: 194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Business Address: 145 - 2475 McDougall Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 3N9

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
13 Sep 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 13 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Curt Juergen Wimmer may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine and pain medicine, only.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Curt Juergen Wimmer may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine and pain medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Sep 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 May 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Mar 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 May 2012

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 17 May 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2010