THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 08:03:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Josephs Healthcare
Medical Bariatric Clinic
100 W 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 5221155
Extension: 37327
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2757 KING ST EAST
ST JOSEPH'S HEALTHCARE HAMILTON
DIABETES CLINIC
Hamilton Ontario L8G 5E4
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Biochemistry
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Biochemistry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ELSHARIF SHBASH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elsharif (CPSO#: 82330 ) Dr. I. Shbash (CPSO#: 82345 )
Business Address: 100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3R2
9055221155 Extn: 37328
Business Address: 100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3R2
9055221155 Extn: 37328
Business Address: 2757 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8G 5E4
9055734819

Corporation Name: Elsharif Shbash Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Apr 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Josephs Healthcare
Medical Bariatric Clinic
100 W 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 5221155
Extension: 37327
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2757 KING ST EAST
ST JOSEPH'S HEALTHCARE HAMILTON
DIABETES CLINIC
Hamilton Ontario L8G 5E4
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Biochemistry
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Biochemistry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ELSHARIF SHBASH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elsharif (CPSO#: 82330 ) Dr. I. Shbash (CPSO#: 82345 )
Business Address: 100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3R2
9055221155 Extn: 37328
Business Address: 100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3R2
9055221155 Extn: 37328
Business Address: 2757 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8G 5E4
9055734819

Corporation Name: Elsharif Shbash Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Apr 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADELL ABDUSALAM ELSHARIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELSHARIF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADELL ABDUSALAM ELSHARIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELSHARIF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2005
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2005