THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:52:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1280 Main St W
McMaster Children hospital
Division of General paediatrics
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: 9055214981

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 14 Aug 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 14 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ELSHARIF SHBASH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elsharif (CPSO#: 82330 ) Dr. I. Shbash (CPSO#: 82345 )
Business Address: 100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3R2
9055221155 Extn: 37328
Business Address: 100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3R2
9055221155 Extn: 37328
Business Address: 2757 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8G 5E4
9055734819

Corporation Name: Elsharif Shbash Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Apr 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1280 Main St W
McMaster Children hospital
Division of General paediatrics
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: 9055214981

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 14 Aug 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 14 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ELSHARIF SHBASH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elsharif (CPSO#: 82330 ) Dr. I. Shbash (CPSO#: 82345 )
Business Address: 100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3R2
9055221155 Extn: 37328
Business Address: 100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3R2
9055221155 Extn: 37328
Business Address: 2757 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8G 5E4
9055734819

Corporation Name: Elsharif Shbash Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Apr 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IMAN AHMED MOHAMED SHBASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHBASH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IMAN AHMED MOHAMED SHBASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHBASH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 May 2005
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 2005