THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 18:11:08 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-5058
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Schwartz Reisman Emergency Centre
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5054
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Luke T. Bearss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Poynter (CPSO#: 82521 ) Dr. L. Bearss (CPSO#: 82438 )
Business Address: Family Practice Unit
Floor 4
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-5158
Business Address: 206 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-5058

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-5058
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Schwartz Reisman Emergency Centre
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5054
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Luke T. Bearss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Poynter (CPSO#: 82521 ) Dr. L. Bearss (CPSO#: 82438 )
Business Address: Family Practice Unit
Floor 4
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-5158
Business Address: 206 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-5058

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUKE TIMOTHY BEARSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEARSS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUKE TIMOTHY BEARSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEARSS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005