THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:46:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1001 Queen St W
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165358501
Extension: 30403
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Luke T. Bearss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Poynter (CPSO#: 82521 ) Dr. L. Bearss (CPSO#: 82438 )
Business Address: Family Practice Unit
Floor 4
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-5158
Business Address: 206 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-5058

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1001 Queen St W
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165358501
Extension: 30403
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Luke T. Bearss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Poynter (CPSO#: 82521 ) Dr. L. Bearss (CPSO#: 82438 )
Business Address: Family Practice Unit
Floor 4
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-5158
Business Address: 206 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-5058

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRITTANY ANNE POYNTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POYNTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRITTANY ANNE POYNTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POYNTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005