THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:28:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: National Defense Headquarters
60 Moodie drive
Ottawa Ontario K1A 0K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136338821
Fax: (613) 732-6666
Address: 101 Joseph street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 8C9
Phone: 6136338821
Fax: 6137326666

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Uttley Rainville Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rainville (CPSO#: 82499 ) Dr. S. Uttley (CPSO#: 82583 )
Business Address: N113 - CFB Petawawa
Petawawa Ontario K0J 1J0
(613) 687-5511
Business Address: 81S11-60 Moodie Dr
Nepean ON K1A 0K6
613-633-8821
Business Address: C-101 Joseph St
Pembroke ON K8A 8C9
613-732-6662

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: National Defense Headquarters
60 Moodie drive
Ottawa Ontario K1A 0K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136338821
Fax: (613) 732-6666
Address: 101 Joseph street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 8C9
Phone: 6136338821
Fax: 6137326666

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Uttley Rainville Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rainville (CPSO#: 82499 ) Dr. S. Uttley (CPSO#: 82583 )
Business Address: N113 - CFB Petawawa
Petawawa Ontario K0J 1J0
(613) 687-5511
Business Address: 81S11-60 Moodie Dr
Nepean ON K1A 0K6
613-633-8821
Business Address: C-101 Joseph St
Pembroke ON K8A 8C9
613-732-6662

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GINETTE DIANE MARIE RAINVILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAINVILLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GINETTE DIANE MARIE RAINVILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAINVILLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005