THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 20:05:41 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
Room AB169
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137978899
Extension: 14555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. English and Enright Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. English (CPSO#: 84955 ) Dr. P. Enright (CPSO#: 82638 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 77220
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Critical Care
F202 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 16405

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
Room AB169
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137978899
Extension: 14555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. English and Enright Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. English (CPSO#: 84955 ) Dr. P. Enright (CPSO#: 82638 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 77220
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Critical Care
F202 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 16405

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAULA DAWN ENRIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENRIGHT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAULA DAWN ENRIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENRIGHT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005