THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/04/25 19:48:15 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Critical Care
1053 Carling Ave
Room F202
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 16405
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. English and Enright Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. English (CPSO#: 84955 ) Dr. P. Enright (CPSO#: 82638 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 77220
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Critical Care
F202 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 16405

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Critical Care
1053 Carling Ave
Room F202
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 16405
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. English and Enright Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. English (CPSO#: 84955 ) Dr. P. Enright (CPSO#: 82638 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 77220
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Critical Care
F202 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 16405

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANE WILLIAM ENGLISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGLISH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANE WILLIAM ENGLISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGLISH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006