THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:26:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Josephs Healthcare
Emergency Department
ER
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055221155
Extension: 33997
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Mackenzie Health - CVH
Emergency Department
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 9054172000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health - Richmond Hill
Emergency Department
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Channan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Channan (CPSO#: 82883 ) Dr. H. Badalato (CPSO#: 84494 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Drive West
CVH
Emergency
Vaughan Ontario L6A 5A9
9054172000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave E
St. Josephs Healthcare
Emergency Department
ER
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055221155
Extension: 33997
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Mackenzie Health - CVH
Emergency Department
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 9054172000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health - Richmond Hill
Emergency Department
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Channan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Channan (CPSO#: 82883 ) Dr. H. Badalato (CPSO#: 84494 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Drive West
CVH
Emergency
Vaughan Ontario L6A 5A9
9054172000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER KRISHAN CHANNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANNAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER KRISHAN CHANNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANNAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005