THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 16:58:38 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Blvd E, Burlington
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 632-3737
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Badalato Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Badalato (CPSO#: 84494 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571
Business Address: 664 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 3A4
(289) 799-2135

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Channan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Channan (CPSO#: 82883 ) Dr. H. Badalato (CPSO#: 84494 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Drive West
CVH
Emergency
Vaughan Ontario L6A 5A9
9054172000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Blvd E, Burlington
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 632-3737
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Badalato Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Badalato (CPSO#: 84494 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571
Business Address: 664 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 3A4
(289) 799-2135

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Channan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Channan (CPSO#: 82883 ) Dr. H. Badalato (CPSO#: 84494 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Drive West
CVH
Emergency
Vaughan Ontario L6A 5A9
9054172000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER ANN BADALATO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADALATO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER ANN BADALATO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BADALATO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006