THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 02:45:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2398
Fax: (905) 813-4284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gagandeep S. Dhillon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dhillon (CPSO#: 84648 ) Dr. R. Sandhu (CPSO#: 83019 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2398
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2398
Fax: (905) 813-4284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gagandeep S. Dhillon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dhillon (CPSO#: 84648 ) Dr. R. Sandhu (CPSO#: 83019 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2398
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAVINDER VICKY SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAVINDER VICKY SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005