THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 03:59:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 The Queensway
St Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Medicine
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: 4165306000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gagandeep S. Dhillon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dhillon (CPSO#: 84648 ) Dr. R. Sandhu (CPSO#: 83019 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2398
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 The Queensway
St Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Medicine
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: 4165306000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gagandeep S. Dhillon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dhillon (CPSO#: 84648 ) Dr. R. Sandhu (CPSO#: 83019 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2398
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GAGANDEEP SINGH DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GAGANDEEP SINGH DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006